U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00002
  • Case Name: Henderson v. Dunlap et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Remark]
  • April 22, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 22, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • April 08, 2025: [Substitute Party]
  • April 08, 2025: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Rebuttal]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 02, 2025: [Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 24, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 17, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 11, 2025: [Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.