U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flores Ortez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 16, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • March 13, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 11, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.