U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00016
  • Case Name: Myers v. Universal Environmental Services, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 07, 2025: [Remark]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summons Issued]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Third Party Complaint]
  • March 19, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 19, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 13, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 13, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.