U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00040
  • Case Name: Adams et al v. Pascagoula-Gautier School District et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 16, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Process]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to Serve Process]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • March 12, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 12, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • March 12, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.