U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 04, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 17, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • March 17, 2025: [Waiver of Appearance at Arraignment Entry of Not Guilty Plea]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 14, 2025: [Remark]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 12, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 12, 2025: [Arrest - Other District]
  • March 12, 2025: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.