U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00153
  • Case Name: Carson v. City of Vicksburg et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 06, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 05, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 02, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 02, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Process]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Omnibus Hearing]
  • April 30, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 30, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 28, 2025: [Attachment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Remark]
  • April 22, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 14, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • April 01, 2025: [Attachment]
  • April 01, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 01, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 01, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Remark]
  • March 20, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 20, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.