U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00025
  • Case Name: Bellipanni v. State of Mississippi et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [State Court Record]
  • March 19, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 18, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 17, 2025: [Joinder in Document]
  • March 14, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.