U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00349
  • Case Name: Parodi v. Evanston Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 10, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 10, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
  • April 01, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
  • April 01, 2025: [Telephonic Discovery Conference]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • March 13, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.