U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00373
  • Case Name: Mitchell v. Manning Trucking LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 12, 2025: [Omnibus Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: [Remark]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Change Venue]
  • March 18, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.