U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00065
  • Case Name: Valles v. Childress
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Response to Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.