U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-00499
  • Case Name: Lockhart v. McDonald et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Appeal Remark]
  • March 12, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.