U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00068
  • Case Name: Swain v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 15, 2025: [Withdraw]
  • May 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • April 25, 2025: [Withdraw]
  • April 14, 2025: [Pro Hac Vice Request Letter]
  • April 07, 2025: [Pro Hac Vice fee paid]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 04, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 27, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 27, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 24, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 13, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Pro Hac Vice Request Letter]
  • March 12, 2025: [Case Transferred Out - District]
  • March 12, 2025: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.