U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00159
  • Case Name: Landry v. Amazon.Com Services, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
  • May 15, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 12, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.