U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00055
  • Case Name: Kilgore et al v. City of Moss Point et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Stay Proceedings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 07, 2025: [Response in Support]
  • April 03, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 02, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Remark]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order of Recusal]
  • March 21, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 21, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.