U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00197
  • Case Name: Dillon et al v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
  • April 07, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Remark]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • March 26, 2025: [Substitute Attorney]
  • March 26, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 20, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 12, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 12, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.