U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00402
  • Case Name: Whitfield v. Wal-Mart, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Service of Designation of Experts]
  • March 18, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.