U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-03126
  • Case Name: Holliday v. Cain et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • May 06, 2025: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 05, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • March 26, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • March 12, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.