U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00199
  • Case Name: Meng v. William Carey University et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay Proceedings]
  • May 08, 2025: [Rebuttal]
  • May 08, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Rebuttal]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 24, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Stay Proceedings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay Proceedings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 28, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 27, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 19, 2025: [Stay Proceedings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.