U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00096
  • Case Name: Hamrick et al v. Carter Motorcars, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • April 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Admissions]
  • March 17, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Admissions]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Admissions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.