U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00172
  • Case Name: Ferguson v. Driven Brands Shared Services LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 13, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.