U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-00593
  • Case Name: Jones v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 16, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 05, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 02, 2025: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • May 02, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 18, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
  • March 19, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.