U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00340
  • Case Name: Whittaker v. Huffman et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 15, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2025: [Response to Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 14, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 13, 2025: [Partial Payment of Filing Fee]
  • March 13, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.