U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00062
  • Case Name: Johnson v. American Family Home Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Remark]
  • May 16, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Admissions]
  • March 18, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 13, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 13, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.