U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00091
  • Case Name: Cooper et al v. Regions Bank
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 30, 2025: [Stay Proceedings]
  • April 30, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Set Aside Judgment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 23, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 16, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
  • April 10, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 10, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 10, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • March 21, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 13, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.