U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00013
  • Case Name: Freeman v. Covington County Justice Court et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Clarify]
  • May 16, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Clarify]
  • April 30, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Remark]
  • April 18, 2025: [Amended Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.