U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00756
  • Case Name: Williamson v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 28, 2025: [Case Management Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 27, 2025: [Telephonic Case Management Conference]
  • March 26, 2025: [Substitute Attorney]
  • March 26, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.