U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00770
  • Case Name: Wright v. Cain et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Response to Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Setting Payment Schedule Opsp6]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Receipt and Cert. (PSP3)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.