U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00012
  • Case Name: Freeman v. Covington County Justice Court et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Compel]
  • May 16, 2025: [Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • May 08, 2025: [Withdraw]
  • May 08, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 08, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 07, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 06, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Entry of Default]
  • April 23, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 22, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 18, 2025: [Remark]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 17, 2025: [Clerks Denial of Entry of Default]
  • March 13, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 13, 2025: [Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.