U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00024-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Lloyd et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 28, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 28, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 17, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 17, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 15, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 18, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 17, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • March 17, 2025: [Substitute Attorney]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 17, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.