U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00174
  • Case Name: Jones v. Roses d/b/a
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Case Management Order]
  • May 14, 2025: [Telephonic Case Management Conference]
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Jury Demand]
  • March 20, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 20, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 17, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.