U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00173
  • Case Name: Wash v. Bedford Care Center of Newton, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Stay Proceedings]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 08, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 30, 2025: [Attachment]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • April 02, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 01, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 01, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 13, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.