U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00296
  • Case Name: Roth v. McBride et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 07, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 07, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Partial Payment of Filing Fee]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.