U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply to Response]
  • April 07, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 25, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • March 19, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 14, 2025: [Praecipe for Summons]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.