U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00004
  • Case Name: Crawford v. A-1 Amusement Masters Productions, INC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 15, 2025: [Subpoena Returned]
  • April 15, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • April 02, 2025: [Subpoena Returned]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 14, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.