U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00236
  • Case Name: Adams v. Bailey et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Notice of Service of Designation of Experts]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
  • March 28, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Service of Designation of Experts]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.