U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00261
  • Case Name: Refre v. City of Philadelphia, Mississippi
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
  • March 25, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 19, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 14, 2025: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.