U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00805
  • Case Name: Boyd v. Posey
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • May 16, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Admissions]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Admissions]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • April 10, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.