U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00228
  • Case Name: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation v. Knowles Construction, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • May 12, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • May 12, 2025: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • May 12, 2025: [Entry of Default]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • April 15, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 15, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Remark]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 09, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.