U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Landrum
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction re Transcript]
  • April 28, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • April 03, 2025: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • April 02, 2025: [Appeal Remark]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 24, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 24, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 24, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.