U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00106
  • Case Name: Johnson et al v. City of Gulfport, Mississippi et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 06, 2025: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • May 05, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 28, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 28, 2025: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.