U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00786
  • Case Name: McRae et al v. ConnectDirect Online, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 16, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 16, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 16, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Staying Case]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay Proceedings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Expedite]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 31, 2025: [Stay Proceedings]
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 27, 2025: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 26, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 26, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Stay Case]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Staying Discovery]
  • March 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.