U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00124
  • Case Name: Wiley v. Centene Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 08, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 02, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 02, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 04, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 01, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.