U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00080
  • Case Name: Hicks v. O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Judgment]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 28, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.