U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00576
  • Case Name: Starr Indemnity & Liability Insurance Company v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 16, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 08, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 01, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • March 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.