U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00782
  • Case Name: Dearman v. Lauderdale County, Mississippi et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 05, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 17, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.