U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00146
  • Case Name: Quarles v. Traylor et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Remark]
  • May 15, 2025: [Affidavit]
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • April 02, 2025: [Consolidate Cases]
  • April 02, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 21, 2025: [Response to Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 17, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.