U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00183
  • Case Name: Abira Medical Laboratories, LLC v. Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, A Mutual Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 12, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 06, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 18, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 18, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 17, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 17, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.