U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00663
  • Case Name: Brown v. Yazoo County, Mississippi et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Admissions]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 04, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Admissions]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
  • April 01, 2025: [Case Management Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Telephonic Case Management Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.