U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00007
  • Case Name: Waits v. Waffle House, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 14, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • March 25, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 25, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 25, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.