U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00150
  • Case Name: Necaise v. Mac Haik Ford, LTD. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 12, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Exclude]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Service of Designation of Experts]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.